OK HB2970 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to the Oklahoma School Testing Program Act; deleting requirements; ACT assessments; emergency.
Title
Schools; relating to the Oklahoma School Testing Program Act; deleting requirements; ACT assessments; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] |
Sen. Susan Paddack [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Todd Thomsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: ACT THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: ACT THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-11 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-11 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-11 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-11 | coauthored by Paddack, Ivester | |
2012-04-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-03 | coauthored by Garrison | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | Emergency added | |
2012-03-14 | Amended | |
2012-03-14 | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2012-03-14 | General Order | |
2012-02-22 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Thomsen | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |