OK HB2969 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Data privacy; Oklahoma Computer Data Privacy Act; consumer protection; civil penalties; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Data privacy; Oklahoma Computer Data Privacy Act; consumer protection; civil penalties; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-29SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2022-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2022-03-28HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2022-03-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2022-03-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 15
2022-03-23HouseAmended by floor substitute
2022-03-23HouseAuthored by Senator Merrick (principal Senate author)
2022-03-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
2022-03-23HouseGeneral Order
2022-02-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sims
2022-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Technology Committee
2022-02-08HouseSecond Reading referred to Technology
2022-02-07HouseAuthored by Representative Walke, West (Josh)
2022-02-07HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2969&Session=2200
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2969%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2969%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2969%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2969%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2969%20FULLPCS1%20COLLIN%20WALKE-MJ.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2969%20FULLPCS2%20COLLIN%20WALKE-AQH.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2969%20FA1%20WALKECO-MJ.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2969%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2969%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2969%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2969%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2969_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback