OK HB2952 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Game and fish; management of depredating animals by use of aircraft; definition of aircraft; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; management of depredating animals by use of aircraft; definition of aircraft; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by Governor 04/24/2018
2018-04-18HouseSent to Governor
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-18HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-17HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-17SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-17SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 2
2018-04-17SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-04-10SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2018-04-09SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-04-09SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Scott
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2018-03-14HouseAmended
2018-03-14HouseHouse Rule suspended
2018-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-07HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Coody
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
294107New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2952&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB2952%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB2952%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2952%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB2952%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB2952%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB2952%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2952_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2952_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2952_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback