OK HB2945 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; increasing property valuation amount for certain notification requirement; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; increasing property valuation amount for certain notification requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Approved by Governor 04/30/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-24 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-24 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-23 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 9 | |
2012-03-15 | Amended | |
2012-03-15 | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2012-03-15 | General Order | |
2012-02-14 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Derby | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |