OK HB2942 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; adding certain substances to Schedule I, Schedule III and Schedule IV; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; adding certain substances to Schedule I, Schedule III and Schedule IV; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Approved by Governor 04/17/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-12 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Derby | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 208 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 309 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 309C | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 329 | New Code | See Bill Text |