OK HB2932 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Medicaid program; directing Health Care Authority to seek certain waiver authority; criteria; exemptions; effective date.
Title
State Medicaid program; directing Health Care Authority to seek certain waiver authority; criteria; exemptions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/07/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-02 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 23 |
2018-05-02 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Pugh, Yen, David, Sykes, Rosino, Dossett, Pittman |
2018-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Health |
2018-04-19 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 11 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rosino |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 26 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amended |
2018-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John) |
2018-03-06 | House | General Order |
2018-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Mulready |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1011 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 230 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |