OK HB2917 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; relating to the Oklahoma Registered Poultry Feeding Operations Act; requiring Nutrient Management Plan for poultry feeding operation; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; relating to the Oklahoma Registered Poultry Feeding Operations Act; requiring Nutrient Management Plan for poultry feeding operation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Approved by Governor 04/17/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-20 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 | |
2012-03-05 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-05 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Richardson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 10 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 500 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |