OK HB2912 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oil and gas; making it unlawful to injure, deface, alter, destroy, or tamper with oil and gas safety equipment. Effective date.
Title
Oil and gas; making it unlawful to injure, deface, alter, destroy, or tamper with oil and gas safety equipment. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Branan [R] | Sen. Harry Coates [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] |
Rep. Danny Morgan [D] | Rep. John Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: , DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: , DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor 04/12/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-06 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Branan | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-29 | coauthored by Gumm | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading | |
2010-02-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-16 | Authored by Senator Coates (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman, Wright (John) | |
2010-02-16 | General Order | |
2010-02-10 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Morgan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |