OK HB2903 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Vetoed 05/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Vetoed 05/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Emergency services; requiring a governing body to notify and provide nine-one-one emergency addresses to a secretary of the county election board.
Title
Emergency services; requiring a governing body to notify and provide nine-one-one emergency addresses to a secretary of the county election board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Vetoed 05/04/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 36; Ayes: 50 Nays: 29 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | Authored by Senator Wyrick (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Morgan | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |