OK HB2901 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Hardin (David), Roberts (Dustin)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Hardin (David), Roberts (Dustin)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; considering certain action as infringing on the right to keep and bear arms; prohibiting termination or retaliation against a law enforcement officer in certain instances; effective date.
Title
Firearms; considering certain action as infringing on the right to keep and bear arms; prohibiting termination or retaliation against a law enforcement officer in certain instances; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Hardin (David), Roberts (Dustin) |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Humphrey |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |