OK HB2897 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco; providing exemption for institutions and facilities of the Department of Corrections; effective date.
Title
Tobacco; providing exemption for institutions and facilities of the Department of Corrections; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion expired |
2020-03-02 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Humphrey |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 44 |
2020-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-02 | House | Amended |
2020-03-02 | House | General Order |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Humphrey |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |