OK HB2894 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; requiring revision of licensing restrictions; codification; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; requiring revision of licensing restrictions; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 5 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Taylor |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |