OK HB2889 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; requiring the Oklahoma State Department of Education to maintain the dyslexia informational handbook; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; requiring the Oklahoma State Department of Education to maintain the dyslexia informational handbook; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2020-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Hill
2020-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Davis
2020-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Townley
2020-03-05SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-04HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2020-03-04HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-18HouseAuthored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
2020-02-18HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Albright
2020-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Sanders
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback