OK HB2889 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fingerprinting fees; clarifying amount sheriffs may charge for fingerprinting handgun license applicants; effective date.
Title
Fingerprinting fees; clarifying amount sheriffs may charge for fingerprinting handgun license applicants; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Zack Taylor [R] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Approved by Governor 05/01/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Scott (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Taylor |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 514 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |