OK HB2885 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; providing time limitation for executing and returning misdemeanor traffic warrants; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; providing time limitation for executing and returning misdemeanor traffic warrants; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dunnington |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Branham |
2020-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-02 | House | Amended |
2020-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-02 | House | General Order |
2020-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Tadlock |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |