OK HB2880 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; net operating loss deductions; excess business losses; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; net operating loss deductions; excess business losses; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-03-23SenateReported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
2021-03-23SenateCoauthored by Representative Kendrix
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 12
2021-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-25HouseAuthored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
2021-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2880&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2880%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2880%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2880%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2880%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2880%20FULLAMD1%20GERRID%20KENDRIX-MAH.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2880%20FULLAMD1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2880%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2880%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2880%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/HB2880%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2880_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2880_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback