OK HB2877 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Victims impact panel programs; sentencing powers of the court; changing fee amount for victims impact panel programs.
Title
Victims impact panel programs; sentencing powers of the court; changing fee amount for victims impact panel programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/19/2020 |
2020-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 13 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Sanders |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |