OK HB2870 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Small Oklahoma Hospital Survival Act; effective date.
Title
Insurance; creating the Small Oklahoma Hospital Survival Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Perryman |
2020-03-02 | House | Remove Representative Perryman as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kiger |
2020-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules |
2020-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Insurance Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Perryman |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |