OK HB2869 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; Student Data Accessibility, Transparency and Accountability Act of 2013; student data; tribal affiliation.
Title
Schools; Student Data Accessibility, Transparency and Accountability Act of 2013; student data; tribal affiliation.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Vancuren [R] | Sen. John Montgomery [R] | Rep. Jacob Rosecrants [D] | Rep. Chelsey Branham [D] |
Rep. Daniel Pae [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5 |
2020-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants, Branham |
2020-02-20 | House | General Order |
2020-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae |
2020-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Vancuren |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |