OK HB2853 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2853

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Coauthored by Senator Garvin
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Health care; creating the Oklahoma Rebate Pass-Through and PBM Meaningful Transparency Act of 2023; definitions; requirements; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care; creating the Oklahoma Rebate Pass-Through and PBM Meaningful Transparency Act of 2023; definitions; requirements; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Garvin
2023-04-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Standridge
2023-04-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Stanley
2023-04-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2023-04-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2023-04-17SenatePlaced on General Order
2023-04-17SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2023-04-11SenateReferred to Appropriations
2023-04-11SenateReported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2023-04-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Kirt
2023-04-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Hicks
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2023-03-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Rogers
2023-03-21SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
2023-03-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad)
2023-03-20HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-22HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2023-02-22HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2853 (Carry Over) 2023-04-20 - Coauthored by Senator Garvin

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2853&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2853%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2853%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2853%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2853%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2853%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2853%20FULLPCS1%20KEVIN%20WALLACE-JM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2853%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2853%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2853%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB2853%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2853_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2853_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback