OK HB2851 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2851

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Investigations; Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; Alaunna Raffield Fund; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investigations; Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; Alaunna Raffield Fund; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11HouseApproved by Governor 05/11/2023
2023-05-09HouseSent to Governor
2023-05-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2023-05-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2023-05-08HouseReferred for enrollment
2023-05-08HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2023-05-08HouseSA's read, adopted
2023-04-27HouseSA's received
2023-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2023-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2023-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-04-12SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2023-04-06SenateReferred to Appropriations
2023-04-06SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2023-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
2023-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2023-03-06HouseAuthored by Senator Green (principal Senate author)
2023-03-06HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2851 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2851&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2851%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2851%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2851%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2851%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2851%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2851%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2851%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB2851%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2851%20FULLPCS1%20KEVIN%20WALLACE-JM.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2851%20FULLPCS2%20KEVIN%20WALLACE-JM.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2851%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2851%20PCS2.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2851%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2851%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2851%20FULLPCS2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2851%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2851%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB2851%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2851%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2851_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2851_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback