OK HB2848 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training; law enforcement certification; allowing for establishment of certain training; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training; law enforcement certification; allowing for establishment of certain training; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2020-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1
2020-03-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dollens
2020-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-20HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2020-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author)
2020-02-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin)
2020-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Pae
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback