OK HB2838 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; Oklahoma Security for Local Public Deposits Act; redeposits; effective date.
Title
Public finance; Oklahoma Security for Local Public Deposits Act; redeposits; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Approved by Governor 04/30/2014 |
2014-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |