OK HB2825 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Poor persons; directing Department of Human Services to pursue service providers for training program referrals; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Poor persons; directing Department of Human Services to pursue service providers for training program referrals; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseApproved by Governor 04/25/2018
2018-04-19HouseSent to Governor
2018-04-19SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-19HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-18HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-18SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-18SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2018-04-18SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-04-09SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2018-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2018-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
2018-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative McEachin
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5623050New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback