OK HB2823 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset extension; extending sunset date on various entities; effective date; emergency.
Title
Sunset extension; extending sunset date on various entities; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: ADOPT SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 65 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: ADOPT SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 65 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 11 |
2020-05-15 | House | Ayes: 65 Nays: 13 |
2020-05-15 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2020-05-12 | House | SA's received |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Emergency added |
2020-05-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Rader |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 16 |
2020-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-19 | House | General Order |
2020-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Gann |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |