OK HB2818 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; beer distributor licenses and nonresident seller licenses; purchase and import of beer; transportation of beer; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; beer distributor licenses and nonresident seller licenses; purchase and import of beer; transportation of beer; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Jason Smalley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Smalley |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator David |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 10 |
2018-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-14 | House | Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-14 | House | General Order |
2018-03-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37A | 2 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 2 | 135 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 3 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 3 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 3 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 3 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |