OK HB2816 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; prohibiting certain officials from using certain public service announcements and advertisements; effective date.
Title
State government; prohibiting certain officials from using certain public service announcements and advertisements; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2016-03-02 | House | General Order |
2016-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Walker |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |