OK HB2813 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training; allowing CLEET to establish and certify certain programs at technology center schools; effective date.
Title
Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training; allowing CLEET to establish and certify certain programs at technology center schools; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rande Worthen [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |