OK HB2808 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public safety; relating to Schedule IV controlled substances; prohibiting the sale of certain products except by certain individuals; providing basis of determination; effective date.
Title
Public safety; relating to Schedule IV controlled substances; prohibiting the sale of certain products except by certain individuals; providing basis of determination; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 46 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 46 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-13 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Roberts (Sean) | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 48 | |
2012-03-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson, Johnson, Tibbs | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |