OK HB2794 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; allowing instruction in early childhood education foster certain development and learning; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; allowing instruction in early childhood education foster certain development and learning; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2
2020-03-09HouseAmended
2020-03-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sterling, Davis, Ranson, Talley, Fincher
2020-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-26HouseAuthored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
2020-02-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Waldron
2020-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2020-02-24HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Rosecrants
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback