OK HB2792 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Coauthored by Senator Shaw
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Coauthored by Senator Shaw
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; requiring Nutrient Management Plans to be prepared by certain persons; emergency.
Title
Agriculture; requiring Nutrient Management Plans to be prepared by certain persons; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Shaw |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hardin (David) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |