OK HB2791 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2791

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-11 - Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation; outdoor advertising definitions; defining term; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation; outdoor advertising definitions; defining term; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11SenateReported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
2023-03-22SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
2023-03-21HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author)
2023-03-21HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-22HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Stinson
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2791 (Carry Over) 2023-04-11 - Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2791&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2791%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2791%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2791%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2791%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2791%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2791%20FULLPCS1%20PRESTON%20STINSON-JBH.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2791%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2791%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2791%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2791_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2791_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback