OK HB2790 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Human Services; membership of boards, commissions or other entities; exemption; effective date.
Title
Department of Human Services; membership of boards, commissions or other entities; exemption; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Walke |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |