OK HB2789 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; adding ex officio member to the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation Commission; effective date.
Title
State government; adding ex officio member to the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation Commission; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Downing [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 25 |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Downing |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |