OK HB2775 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 52-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 52-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; making an appropriation to the State Board of Education; establishing minimum salary schedule; modifying State Aid weights; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; making an appropriation to the State Board of Education; establishing minimum salary schedule; modifying State Aid weights; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 17 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 17 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Died in conference |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, McCortney, Daniels, Pugh, Pemberton, Seifried, Brooks |
2023-04-17 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Special Conference Committee on HB 2775 and HB 1935 |
2023-03-30 | House | SA's received |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Woods |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator McCortney, Thompson (Roger), Paxton, Hall, Coleman, Rader, Stephens, Burns, Jech, Newhouse, Stewart, Prieto, Montgomery, Murdock, Pederson, Dugger, Pemberton, Weaver, Stanley, Garvin, Green, Kidd, Seifried, Alvord, Haste, Gollihare |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rosino |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Daniels |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Daniels; authored by Senator Treat |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pugh |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Culver |
2023-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-02-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 20 |
2023-02-22 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2023-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett |
2023-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore, Moore, Humphrey, Luttrell, Caldwell (Chad), Maynard, Echols, Hilbert |
2023-02-22 | House | General Order |
2023-02-20 | House | Emergency added |
2023-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker |
2023-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |