OK HB2774 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Approved by Governor 04/07/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Approved by Governor 04/07/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Jurors; modifying exemption from jury duty; effective date.
Title
Jurors; modifying exemption from jury duty; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Approved by Governor 04/07/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2014-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-25 | House | General Order |
2014-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Nollan |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |