OK HB2771 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; creating the Oklahoma Department of Labor Occupational License Database; codification; effective date.
Title
Labor; creating the Oklahoma Department of Labor Occupational License Database; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 13 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn (Mike) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |