OK HB2769 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public finance; funding of common education by certain date; repealer; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; funding of common education by certain date; repealer; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/24/2019
2019-05-21HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-21SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-21HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-21HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-21SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
2019-05-21SenateJCR adopted
2019-05-20SenateDirect to Calendar
2019-05-17SenateFirst Reading
2019-05-17HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-05-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-05-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 20
2019-05-17HouseJCR adopted
2019-05-17HouseGeneral Order
2019-05-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck
2019-05-16HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2019-04-02HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Rader
2019-04-02HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2019-04-02HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace, Hilbert
2019-04-02HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback