OK HB2758 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2758
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Medicolegal Investigations; legislative intent related to certain construction; utilization of certain resources.
Title
Board of Medicolegal Investigations; legislative intent related to certain construction; utilization of certain resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2019 |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-05-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-21 | House | JCR adopted |
2019-05-21 | House | General Order |
2019-05-20 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2019-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Rader |
2019-04-02 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2019-04-02 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Hilbert |
2019-04-02 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2758 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019