OK HB2756 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; qualified clean-burning motor fuel vehicles; tax years; tax credit cap; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; qualified clean-burning motor fuel vehicles; tax years; tax credit cap; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 17 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boggs |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bice |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 7 |
2018-03-12 | House | Emergency removed |
2018-03-12 | House | Title restored |
2018-03-12 | House | Amended |
2018-03-12 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Calvey, Inman, Virgin |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Title stricken |
2018-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter, ODonnell |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |