OK HB2752 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Liens; self-service storage; defining terms; limiting liability and value of damaged property; allowing for online sales; effective date.
Title
Liens; self-service storage; defining terms; limiting liability and value of damaged property; allowing for online sales; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Elise Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | Referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hall |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |