OK HB2750 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2750

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Endowed chair funding; modifying maximum aggregate amount of certain obligations of the Capitol Improvement Authority; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Endowed chair funding; modifying maximum aggregate amount of certain obligations of the Capitol Improvement Authority; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-22 - House - House: VETO OVERRIDE WITHOUT EMER (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2004-01-01 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2020-05-22SenateMeasure returned to House
2020-05-22SenateVeto overridden: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2020-05-22HouseTo Senate
2020-05-22HouseVeto overridden: Ayes: 92 Nays: 6
2020-05-22HouseVetoed 05/18/2020
2020-05-12HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-12SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-12HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-12HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-12SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
2020-05-12SenateJCR adopted
2020-05-11SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-07SenateFirst Reading
2020-05-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-05-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-05-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 4
2020-05-07HouseJCR adopted
2020-05-07HouseGeneral Order
2020-05-06HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2019-04-02HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Rader
2019-04-02HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2019-04-02HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace, Hilbert
2019-04-02HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2750 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback