OK HB2747 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement; creating the Oklahoma Blue Alert Act; directing the Department of Public Safety to develop and implement statewide blue alert system; effective date.
Title
Law enforcement; creating the Oklahoma Blue Alert Act; directing the Department of Public Safety to develop and implement statewide blue alert system; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Morrissette [D] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Sen. Corey Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2016 |
2016-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | coauthored by Brooks |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee sub-committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Morrissette |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |