OK HB2744 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2744
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Tax Exemption Fraud Prevention Act of 2021; Sale for Resale permits; authorizing Tax Commission to administer permits; online system; codification; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Tax Exemption Fraud Prevention Act of 2021; Sale for Resale permits; authorizing Tax Commission to administer permits; online system; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 20 |
2021-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2021-03-03 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | Emergency removed |
2021-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Ford |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2744 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee