OK HB2744 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; providing that certain permits, licenses and fees are not required for certain persons to sell edible goods at certain temporary food establishments; effective date.
Title
Public health; providing that certain permits, licenses and fees are not required for certain persons to sell edible goods at certain temporary food establishments; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Condit |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |