OK HB2732 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; creating the Correctional Officer Safety Act of 2014; modifying eligibility requirements for earned credits; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; creating the Correctional Officer Safety Act of 2014; modifying eligibility requirements for earned credits; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 62
2014-03-13HouseAmended
2014-03-13HouseHouse Rule suspended
2014-03-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Virgin, McDaniel (Jeannie), Shelton
2014-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2014-02-19HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2014-02-19HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2014-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Cleveland
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21131New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback