OK HB2727 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2727
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; permitting Adulting 101 to be taught as an elective in public schools as funding becomes available; effective date.
Title
Schools; permitting Adulting 101 to be taught as an elective in public schools as funding becomes available; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] | Sen. David Bullard [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Tammy West [R] |
Rep. Denise Brewer [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Brewer |
2021-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 26 |
2021-03-10 | House | Amended |
2021-03-10 | House | House Rule suspended |
2021-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-10 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Lowe (Dick) |
2021-03-10 | House | General Order |
2021-02-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Lowe (Dick), West (Tammy) |
2021-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Pittman |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2727 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee