OK HB2727 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring school districts to adopt policy regarding maximum number of days certain substitute teachers may be employed for same assignment; effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring school districts to adopt policy regarding maximum number of days certain substitute teachers may be employed for same assignment; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Approved by Governor 04/17/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-20 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2012-02-21 | First Reading | |
2012-02-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin | |
2012-02-20 | General Order | |
2012-02-14 | Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-14 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Inman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |