OK HB2722 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Workers' Compensation; modifying definition; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation; modifying definition; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseApproved by Governor 05/01/2018
2018-04-25HouseSent to Governor
2018-04-25SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-25HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-24HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-24SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2018-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-04-10SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 17
2018-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass General Government Committee
2018-02-28HouseReferred to General Government Oversight and Accountability
2018-02-28HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Russ
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7024100New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback