OK HB2719 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Aerospace Commerce Economic Services; appropriation; purpose.
Title
Aerospace Commerce Economic Services; appropriation; purpose.
Sponsors
Rep. Tess Teague [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Sen. Jack Fry [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fry |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pugh |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 38; Ayes: 51 Nays: 38 |
2018-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-14 | House | Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Teague |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |